Multiplying 2- and 3-Digit Numbers

Learn all about multiplying two-digit numbers and multiplying three-digit numbers in this free lesson, which includes practice problems.

Practice!

Practice multiplying large numbers. Then check your answer by typing it in the box.

Set 1

13 x 3 =
42 x 4 =
21 x 9 =
63 x 2 =
52 x 3 =

Set 2

76 x 5 =
24 x 8 =
63 x 7 =
18 x 6 =
35 x 9 =

Set 3

21 x 18 =
33 x 34 =
46 x 29 =
17 x 12 =
55 x 48 =

Assessment

Want even more practice? Try out a short assessment to test your skills by clicking the link below:

Start Assessment